Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr and Moon
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to charge a late fee not exceeding $25 for registration renewals that occur more than 1 week after a registration has expired.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-910 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM
Click to return on the top page