Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Education - WhyTry Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the WhyTry Program in Baltimore County; specifying the purpose of the Program is to assist a student with an unweighted grade point average of less than 2.0 per quarter and an attendance rate of less than 94% of the required days of school attendance to become a more effective student; requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to develop and implement the Program; requiring the Board of Education to select two specified middle schools to participate in the Program; requiring the Program to include specified teachers; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1128 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
5/26/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 5/26/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM