Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Employers With On-Site Health Clinics - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from certain provisions of law governing earned sick and safe leave certain employees who regularly work at facilities at which the employer offers the employees access to an on-site health clinic that has operating costs of at least $1,000,000 per year and provides access to discounted prescription drugs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0038
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Employers With On-Site Health Clinics - Exemption
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM