Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Reconstruction Advisory Group and Traffic Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Chesapeake Bay Bridge Reconstruction Advisory Group; requiring the Advisory Group to hold monthly meetings and study issues associated with traffic on the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and U.S. Route 50 between the Severn River and Kent Narrows Bridges; requiring the Advisory Group to report its recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by July 1, 2021, and each July thereafter; requiring a certain traffic management study by the Maryland Department of Transportation; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0013
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/10/2019
Legislative Date
10/10/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/10/2019 10/10/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Reconstruction Advisory Group and Traffic Study
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM