Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations that require, to the extent practicable and economically feasible, a large family child care home or child care center to use environmentally preferable green product cleaning supplies, establish guidelines for purchasing certain green product cleaning supplies, establish green cleaning practices, and require a large family child care home or child care center that does not procure green cleaning products to provide written notice to the Department by June 30 each year; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1330 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/02/2017
Legislative Date
11/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/02/2017 11/02/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
(   9.5-303, 9.5-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page