Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain animal shelter to conform certain protocols with certain provisions of law; providing that certain provisions do not apply to an animal experiencing irremediable physical suffering; requiring an animal shelter to take reasonable steps to achieve a save rate of 90% of impounded animals; requiring an animal shelter to make certain animals available to be reclaimed by an owner for at least a certain number of days; requiring an animal shelter to make a reasonable effort to identify an impounded animal; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/14/2019
Legislative Date
8/14/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/14/2019 8/14/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   2-1701, 2-1704, 2-1705.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM