Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax a sale of a textbook that is bought by a full-time or part-time student enrolled at an institution of higher education.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0038 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/10/2013 1/10/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/10/2013 1/10/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM