Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Members of Boards and Advisory Committees - Prohibition Against Concurrent Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Lierman, Morhaim, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from serving concurrently as a member of a health occupations board or a specified advisory committee and as an elected officer of a specified professional association that advocates for the interests of the individuals regulated by that health occupations board; and defining specified terms.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766588/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {766588/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM