Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegate McMillan
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution prohibiting specified transfers of dedicated State funds to the General Fund except for specified purposes under specified circumstances; requiring the Governor to include specified provisions in the budget that provide for the repayment of specified dedicated State funds under specified circumstances within a specified period of time; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0023 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/08/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/08/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
12/20/2012 Text - First - Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM