Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property as an independent unit in the Executive Branch; placing the Commission under the Department of General Services for administrative and budgetary purposes; authorizing the Commission to sell, transfer, or otherwise dispose of specified property and enter into contracts and execute specified instruments to carry out its purpose; terminating the Act on June 30, 2019; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0028 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2016
Legislative Date
10/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2016 10/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 31
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM