Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Brain Injury Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates McConkey, Waldstreicher, Barve, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Cullison, Elliott, Frank, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Brain Injury Trust Fund as a special fund used to support specified services for individuals with brain injuries; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene or the Secretary's designee to administer the Fund; requiring the Secretary or the Secretary's designee to make specified reports; establishing eligibility for individuals to receive assistance from the Fund; requiring that specified investment earnings be credited to the Fund; requiring a specified report to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {606788/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2013 1/10/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {606788/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-21A-01 through 13-21A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM