Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regulated Firearms - License Issued by Delaware, Pennsylvania, Virginia, or West Virginia - Reciprocity
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a license to carry a regulated firearm, including a concealed regulated firearm, issued to an individual by Delaware, Pennsylvania, Virginia, or West Virginia is valid in Maryland.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1421 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
8/01/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 8/01/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM