Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the amount used in a calculation to determine whether retirees receiving an ordinary disability retirement allowance from the State Retirement and Pension System are subject to a specified reemployment earnings limitation.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0038 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2016
Legislative Date
10/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2016 10/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {524966/1 Adopted 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 26
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM