Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement Contracts - Gender Wage Gap Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the application of the Act to certain procurements; requiring bidders or offerors to report the difference between the mean and median wages of male employees and female employees when submitting a bid or an offer on a procurement contract to a unit of State or local government; requiring bidders or offerors to submit the number of employees used for the determination of gender wage gap calculations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement Contracts - Gender Wage Gap Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement Contracts - Gender Wage Gap Reporting
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM