Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Penalties and Prohibition Applied to Neighborhood Watch
Sponsored by
Delegate Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the penalty for a first and second or subsequent violation of the prohibition against harassment; and clarifying that the prohibition against harassing another person applies to a member of a neighborhood watch organization.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
8/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 8/13/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM