Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring employers that employ 15 or more employees to provide employees with earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same wage rate as the employee normally earns; requiring employers with 14 or fewer employees to provide an employee with unpaid earned sick and safe leave; providing for the manner in which earned sick and safe leave is accrued; authorizing an employee to work additional hours or trade shifts with another employee under specified circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0580 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2016
Legislative Date
10/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2016 10/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM