Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and Probation
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain judicial officer to consider including, if requested by a victim, electronic monitoring that provides a certain victim notification as a condition of pretrial release; authorizing a judge to order that a defendant be subject to electronic monitoring that provides a certain victim notification as a condition of pretrial release; specifying that the court may include electronic monitoring that provides a certain victim notification as a condition of probation; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and Probation
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   11-101, 11-203, 5-201, 5-202, 5-213.1, 6-220 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page