Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness - Standard of Proof
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering, from clear and convincing evidence to a preponderance of the evidence, the standard of proof by which a judge in a certain criminal case must make certain findings before the judge may admit a certain statement into evidence.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1303 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness - Standard of Proof
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness - Standard of Proof
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM