Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Exemption - Individuals Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland income tax does not apply to the income of an individual erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined under State law for a crime the individual did not commit; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations to provide procedures for an individual to apply for and be recognized as erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined under State law for a crime the individual did not commit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Exemption - Individuals Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM