Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a restriction that prohibits specified gaming licensees in Dorchester County from holding gaming events or carnivals on a Sunday.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0006
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0407 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 Reassigned to Ways and Means 9
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 32
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 35
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 34B
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1202, 13-1203, 13-1204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM