Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Creating a public financing system for General Assembly candidates; repealing the Public Financing Act for gubernatorial candidates; repealing specified provisions of law related to the authority of a governing body of a county to establish, by law, a system of public campaign financing for specified elective offices; authorizing the governing body of a county to enact laws to regulate public campaign finance activity for specified offices and candidates; specifying expenditure limits for participating candidates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/08/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/08/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-235, 13-505, 15-101 through 15-111, 15-101 through 15-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM