Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") - Limit on Number of Providers - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from limiting the number of Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") providers that operate in the State if the providers otherwise meet the federal and State requirements for participation in the Program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") - Limit on Number of Providers - Prohibition
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM