Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Buckel, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the Department of Information Technology, to make publicly available on the Internet each meeting agenda made available at least 24 hours in advance of each meeting, live video streaming, and unedited archived video recordings of open meetings; requiring the State Board to prepare written minutes after each meeting; requiring the Department to provide the staff to the State Board necessary to stream live video of the open meetings of the State Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496989/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {496989/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM