Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Bagnall, Johnson, Korman, Lierman, and Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act to require the Department of Budget and Management to include in a searchable website payments made by units of State government that receive funds that are not appropriated in the annual budget bill; requiring the Department to update the payment data on the searchable website on or before the 15th day of the month that follows the month in which an agency makes a payment to a payee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM