Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Acevero, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Cassilly, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Gaines, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jackson, Kelly, Kerr, Lafferty, Lopez, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Fiscal Year 2017 Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program to provide rebates to individuals who purchased qualified equipment in fiscal year 2017 but did not receive the rebate; limiting the rebate to an applicant who owns the equipment on the date the applicant applies for the rebate; allowing a credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for certain qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; limiting the credit to certain vehicle owners; terminating the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM