Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Rescinding the State's consent to enter into the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote and repealing the statutory provisions reciting the Agreement; repealing specified provisions of law relating to the nomination of presidential electors; specifying that presidential electors in the State are elected at large by the voters of the entire State; specifying that presidential electors cast their votes in a specified manner; repealing a contingency relating to the State's entry into the Agreement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0387 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-503 through 8-505, 8-5A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM