Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Hixson, C. Howard, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Platt, S. Robinson, and Walker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to institute an action in a circuit court for injunctive relief to prohibit a person from engaging in or continuing to engage in specified violations of election law, except in specified circumstances; authorizing the State Prosecutor to seek injunctive relief in specified circumstances in which the Attorney General is prohibited from seeking injunctive relief under the Act; requiring a showing of specified evidence before injunctive relief may be granted under the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0192
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0224 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {385363/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Turner) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {495164/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {273323/1 Rejected (49-85)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {283122/1 Rejected (45-92)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {443826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments {385363/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 42
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Turner) Adopted 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {495164/1 Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {273323/1 Rejected (49-85) 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {283122/1 Rejected (45-92) 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {443826/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1003, 16-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM