Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a minor who is at least 16 years old and who is a registered voter to be appointed and serve as an election judge; requiring the State Board of Elections to survey the local boards of elections concerning minor election judges authorized by the Act; and requiring the State Board to report the survey results and its findings and recommendations concerning the value of 16-year-old election judges to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before February 1, 2019.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age and Minimum Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {715663/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-4)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age and Minimum Compensation
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {715663/1 Adopted 38
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-4) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum Age
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM