Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual in a restaurant, club, or hotel for which any license allowing the sale of wine is issued to consume wine not purchased from or provided by the license holder under specified circumstances, including a requirement that the license holder obtain a corkage permit; and requiring each local licensing board to issue a corkage permit at no charge.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473892/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {473892/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM