Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of Scope
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Serafini, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship Program to be the Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program; expanding the scope of the Program to include fall and spring public service internships; and specifying the dates of January 15 for the scholarship awards for spring internships, May 1 for summer internships, and August 1 for fall internships.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1701, 18-1702, 18-1704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM