Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 to remove the matching fund requirement for specified grants for Chesapeake High Stadium.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text - Chapter - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page