Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that before the Calvert County Board of License Commissioners submits a legislative proposal to the Calvert County Delegation for introduction as a bill in a session of the General Assembly, the Board must post notice of the proposal and hold a public hearing at least 6 months before the start of the session.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1054 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM