Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Lierman, Oaks, Rosenberg, M. Washington, R. Lewis, and McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners, by January 1, 2018, to develop and implement a scoring system for evaluating specified public school projects and, on or before January 1, 2020, to apply the scoring system to 75% of specified public school facilities, publish project scores on the Baltimore City Public School's Web site, and report project scores to the General Assembly; requiring the Board, by January 1, 2021, to apply the scoring system to the remaining 25% of public school facilities; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {914860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {914860/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
(   4-301, 4-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page