Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain actions of the Baltimore County Board of Education be taken at a public meeting; requiring that any action of the county board be recorded by a voice vote or a roll call vote of certain members of the county board; requiring the county board to keep a formal record of certain public meetings and to make the record available for review by the public on request; requiring that any final action of the board be made publicly available on the board's website within 72 hours of the time the action was taken; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {575865/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {575865/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2B-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM