Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2022, a person from applying certain coal tar pavement products to pavement or a similar surface; providing that the Act does not apply to a wastewater treatment facility that uses coal tar to seal components of a sewerage system; and establishing a civil penalty not exceeding $500 for a first offense and not exceeding $1,000 for a second or subsequent offense for certain violations.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/01/2020
Legislative Date
9/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/01/2020 9/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Environment – Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 11:02 AM