Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Anderson, Bromwell, Cardin, K. Kelly, Kramer, Smigiel, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; establishing that in an action against a person other than an owner of a dog for specified damages, the common law prior to April 1, 2012, is retained as to the person without regard to the breed or heritage of the dog; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {792616/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {792616/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM