Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, J. Lewis, Lopez, Mosby, and Shetty
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in an annual report certain statistics on job classifications for inmate labor, certain daily wage scales, and the total number of inmates currently employed at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain similar statistics regarding inmate employment and wages.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0628 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-30)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (109-30) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
(   3-207, 3-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page