Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Watson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the criteria for determining the use of funds in the Bay Restoration Fund for certain purposes in certain fiscal years to include climate resiliency and flood control; and specifying that certain grants to certain local governments may be used for stormwater management measures that include stormwater measures relating to water quality, climate resiliency, or flood control.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {640215/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49B
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:32 PM