Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim and Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from specified regulation the distribution of raw milk and raw milk products from milk producers directly to the final consumer if the consumer has acquired an ownership interest in the animal or herd from which the raw milk is produced; requiring the consumer and the milk producer to enter into a written contract of agistment relating to a specified ownership interest; establishing that the exemption does not apply to specified sales of milk and milk products; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0003 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-403, 21-434 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM