Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing all counties, rather than only counties with fewer than a certain number of registered voters, to establish one early voting center in addition to the number of early voting centers that the county is required to establish if the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local board of elections, and the governing body of the county agree to establish an additional early voting center
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Establishment and Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {225068/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-16)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Establishment and Hours
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {225068/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (120-16) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM