Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "technology-based business" to include a nonprofit organization exempt from taxation under § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code for purposes of the Maryland Technology Internship Program; and altering from 3.0 to 2.5 the cumulative grade point average that a certain individual must maintain or have maintained during a certain academic year to qualify for participation in the Maryland Technology Internship Program.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1237 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Reassigned to Appropriations 7
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 11:30 AM