Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the meaning of "newspaper" or "newspaper in general circulation" when referring to the publication of a certain legal advertisement or legal notice to include certain publications that are offered in a print format or through a dedicated website under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0305
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:31 PM