Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Cullison, Miele, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Morales, Morgan, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing "confinement" as a condition of disability for purposes of guardianship proceedings to protect a disabled individual's property; and repealing "confinement" as a condition of incapacity as defined under the Maryland Trust Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {666081/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {666081/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement
(   13-201, 14.5-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page