Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr (Chair, Joint Committee on Federal Relations)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions relating to the Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact; repealing a requirement that the Governor execute the compact with the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia under specified circumstances; repealing the Woodrow Wilson Memorial Bridge and Tunnel Authority; repealing a requirement that the compact may not be interpreted to affect the levy of specified taxes; repealing the specified powers of the Authority to operate a project to upgrade the Interstate 95 Potomac River crossing; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0125
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Finance 31
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Text - Chapter - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-302, 10-303 )
(   1995, 1996 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM