Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing and revising provisions of law relating to trusts; providing that the Act may be cited as the Maryland Trust Act; providing for the scope of the Act; establishing whether a person has knowledge of a fact under the Act; establishing that a term of a trust prevails over specified other provisions of law, with specified exceptions; establishing that the common law of trusts and principles of equity supplement the Act, with a specified exception; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0240
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0437 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912610/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {393327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748477/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {823428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {912610/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {393327/1 Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {748477/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {823428/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 14.5-101 through 14.5-1006, 14-101 through 14-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM