Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Glass, Hill, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Patterson, Reilly, Reznik, Rose, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified income of specified individuals resulting from the discharge of student loan indebtedness by repealing a requirement that the discharge must be due to total and permanent disability or death; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM