Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting public and nonpublic school employees from operating an electric retractable room partition in a school except under certain circumstances; requiring any annual safety review, evaluation, or exercise for school employees in a school building to include information and demonstrations regarding the safe operation of an electric retractable room partition; requiring the State Department of Education to develop and disseminate model safety guidelines on the safe operation of electric retractable room partitions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0104
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 8:17 AM