Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - Interpretation
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a caption or catchline accompanying a section or subsection of law is to be interpreted in a specified manner unless otherwise provided by law.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 38
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM