Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale certain child care products containing one-tenth of 1% of certain flame-retardant chemicals and intended for use by a child under the age of 12 years; authorizing the Secretary of Health to suspend implementation of certain provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a certain determination; altering the date by which the Maryland Department of Health is required to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM