Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Hettleman, Feldmark, Glenn, Guyton, Hill, Jackson, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Queen, Smith, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, C. Watson, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose and use of the Maryland Farms and Families Fund to include grants to nonprofit farmers markets and local nonprofit organizations; authorizing the Department of Agriculture, when awarding grants, to consider a nonprofit organization's record of providing services in food deserts; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a $100,000 appropriation to the Fund which is in addition to, and may not supplant, any funding appropriated to a certain division in the Department; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424267/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-6)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Reassigned to Appropriations 9
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {424267/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-6) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {717279/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Text - Chapter - Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-2001, 10-2002, 10-2003, 10-2004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM